Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father William Gaudreau, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Sep 1897Born
2 Aug 192224.8ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
19 Jun 192729.7Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
6 Feb 195456.3AppointedSuperior General of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
11 Sep 196769.9ResignedSuperior General of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
29 Nov 196871.1DiedSuperior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer

MicroData Summary for William Gaudreau
Father William Gaudreau C.SS.R. (born , died ) Superior General Emeritus of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSouth Braintree, USA

  • a priest for 41.4 years

Source(s):

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast