Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé García Jiménez y Rabadán

Deceased

Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1622BornZalamea la Real, Spain
16 Mar 166542.4AppointedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
31 May 166542.6Ordained BishopBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain
14 Jun 169067.7DiedBishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}, Spain

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé García Jiménez y Rabadán:
Bishop Bartolomé García Jiménez y Rabadán (born , died ) Bishop of Islas Canarias {Canary Islands}

  • a bishop for 25.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 132
  • bp/ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 201, Number 1,258
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,952

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.7, 12 Jan 2014; data: 14 Jan 2014