Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Garcia de Aragón, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Mallorca, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Jul 1439AppointedBishop of Ales (Uselli), Italy
5 Oct 1444AppointedBishop of Siracusa, Italy
3 Feb 1446AppointedBishop of Mallorca, Spain
20 Jul 1459DiedBishop of Mallorca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Juan Garcia de Aragón
Bishop Juan Garcia de Aragón O.P. (died ) Bishop of Mallorca

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 261, and Page 244
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 184
  • b: CB, 19 Aug 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast