Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Julián Garcés, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1452²Born
24 Jan 151967.0AppointedBishop of Carolense (Yucatán), México
13 Oct 152573.7AppointedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
1 Dec 152674.9Ordained BishopBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
9 Nov 152977.8InstalledBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México
7 Dec 154290.9DiedBishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles), México

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Julián Garcés
Bishop Julián Garcés O.P. (born 1452, died ) Bishop of Tlaxcala (Puebla de los Angeles)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMunébraga, Spain

  • a bishop for 16.0 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,802
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 33, Number 137
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 338, and Page 314

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast