Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni de Gantes

Deceased

Bishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
25 May 1598AppointedBishop of Gaeta, Italy
28 Apr 1604AppointedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy
24 Sep 1605DiedBishop of Mazara del Vallo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni de Gantes
Bishop Giovanni de Gantes (died ) Bishop of Mazara del Vallo

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 127, and Page 235
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 200
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1598, Number 12*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast