Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni Agostino Gandolfo

Deceased

Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateEventTitle
28 Jan 1619AppointedBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
10 Feb 1619Ordained BishopBishop of Fondi (Fundi), Italy
3 Dec 1635AppointedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy
Sep 1653³DiedBishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Agostino Gandolfo:
Bishop Giovanni Agostino Gandolfo Bishop of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a bishop for 34.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 4, Page 191, and Page 71
  • ob/c2+: Sacres Episcopaux a Rome de 1565 a 1662, Page 65, Number 380

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013