Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marco Giacinto Gandolfo

Deceased

Bishop of Noli, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1658Born
26 Oct 168729.3Ordained PriestPriest
28 Apr 171354.8AppointedBishop of Noli, Italy
1 May 171354.8Ordained BishopBishop of Noli, Italy
16 Apr 173778.8DiedBishop of Noli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Marco Giacinto Gandolfo
Bishop Marco Giacinto Gandolfo (born , died ) Bishop of Noli

EventPlace
Birth PlacePorto Maurizio, Diocese of Albenga
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceGenova, Archdiocese of Genova

  • a priest for 49.4 years
  • a bishop for 23.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 281
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1713, Number 12
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 238, Number 19,919
  • ob: AT, 9 Mar 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 11 Mar 2019

Quantcast