Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gregorio Antonio Gallo de Andrade

Deceased

Bishop of Segovia, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Mar 1509Born
22 Aug 156556.4AppointedBishop of Orihuela, Spain
11 Sep 157768.5AppointedBishop of Segovia, Spain
25 Sep 157970.5DiedBishop of Segovia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gregorio Antonio Gallo de Andrade
Bishop Gregorio Antonio Gallo de Andrade (born , died ) Bishop of Segovia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBurgos, Diocese of Burgos
Death PlaceSegovia, Diocese of Segovia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 263, and Page 296
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 77, Number 454
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1565, Number 23*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast