Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Antonio Andrea Cardinal Galli, C.R.SS.S. †

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Nov 1697BornBologna, Italy
26 Nov 175356.0Elevated to Cardinal
10 Dec 175356.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Alessio
23 May 175759.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli
24 Mar 176769.3DiedCardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

MicroData Summary for Antonio Andrea Galli:
Cardinal Antonio Andrea Galli C.R.SS.S. (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Pietro in Vincoli

  • a cardinal for 13.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 26 Nov 1753

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013