Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlo Francesco Gallarini

Deceased

Bishop of Bobbio, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Dec 1660Born
1 Jan 169130.0Ordained DeaconDeacon
7 Jan 169130.0Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jan 171453.0AppointedBishop of Bobbio, Italy
25 Feb 171453.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bobbio, Italy
9 Sep 171655.7DiedBishop of Bobbio, Italy

MicroData Summary for Carlo Francesco Gallarini
Bishop Carlo Francesco Gallarini (born , died ) Bishop of Bobbio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}
Death PlaceMilano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}
Buried Place (Original)Blessed Virgin altar, San Fedele, Church, Milano, Archdiocese of Milano {Milan}

  • a priest for 25.6 years
  • a bishop for 2.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 122
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1714, Number 38
  • ob/d: AT, 9 Aug 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast