Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Angelo Galzerin, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ampurias e Civita


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Jan 1661³BornCagliari
18 Feb 169029.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
10 Mar 169029.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
6 Nov 172665.8SelectedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
17 Mar 172766.1ConfirmedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
26 Oct 172766.7Ordained BishopBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy
Sep 1735³74.6DiedBishop of Ampurias e Civita, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Angelo Galzerin:
Bishop Angelo Galzerin O.F.M. Conv. (born , died Sep 1735) Bishop of Ampurias e Civita

  • a priest for 45.4 years
  • a bishop for 7.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1734
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 82
  • ob: CB, 17 Jan 2014
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,034
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1727, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015