Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gaetano Galbato

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Messina

Titular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1707BornTortoreto
19 May 173124.1Ordained PriestPriest of Messina, Italy
17 Mar 175547.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy
17 Mar 175547.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Amathus in Palaestina
176961.7DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Messina, Italy

Note(s): ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Gaetano Galbato:
Bishop Gaetano Galbato (born , died 1769) Auxiliary Bishop of Messina

  • a priest for 37.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 79, and Page 451
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1755, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.1.0, 17 Nov 2015; Data: 13 Dec 2015