Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alfonso Galaz Torrero

Deceased

Bishop of Tui, Spain


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1635²Born
23 Mar 168247.2SelectedBishop of Tui, Spain
25 May 168247.3ConfirmedBishop of Tui, Spain
13 Mar 168853.1DiedBishop of Tui, Spain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alfonso Galaz Torrero
Bishop Alfonso Galaz Torrero (born 1635, died ) Bishop of Tui

EventPlace
Birth PlacePuerto de Santa María

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 394
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 223, Number 1,383
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1682, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast