Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Walter Gainsborough, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Oct 1302AppointedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
28 Oct 1302Ordained BishopBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain
17 Sep 1307DiedBishop of Worcester, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Walter Gainsborough
Bishop Walter Gainsborough O.F.M. (died ) Bishop of Worcester

EventPlace
Ordained BishopRoma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 4.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 528
  • ob/c2: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 69
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 53
  • ofm: CB, 20 Mar 2016
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 84, Number 6,934

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast