Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luis García Haro de Sotomayor

Deceased

Bishop of Málaga


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Oct 1564AppointedBishop of Cádiz, Spain
7 Aug 1587AppointedBishop of Málaga, Spain
14 Aug 1597DiedBishop of Málaga, Spain

MicroData Summary for Luis García Haro de Sotomayor:
Bishop Luis García Haro de Sotomayor (died ) Bishop of Málaga

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 75, Number 445
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 200, and Page 233

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015