Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Francsco Antonio Javier Cardinal de Gardoqui Arriquíbar

Deceased

Priest of Palencia, Spain

Cardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1747Born
1 Jun 177628.6Ordained PriestPriest of Palencia, Spain
8 Mar 181668.4Elevated to Cardinal
15 Nov 181770.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of Sant’Anastasia
27 Jan 182072.2DiedPriest of Palencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Francsco Antonio Javier de Gardoqui Arriquíbar
Francsco Antonio Javier Cardinal de Gardoqui Arriquíbar (born , died ) Priest of Palencia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBilbao

  • a priest for 43.6 years
  • a cardinal for 3.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 8 Mar 1816

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018