Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Wiguläus Fröschl von Marzoll

Deceased

Bishop of Passau, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1445Born
14 Jan 150054.7SelectedBishop of Passau, Germany
29 Apr 150055.0ConfirmedBishop of Passau, Germany
14 May 150055.1Ordained BishopBishop of Passau, Germany
6 Nov 151772.5DiedBishop of Passau, Germany

MicroData Summary for Wiguläus Fröschl von Marzoll (VIAF: 74728185)
Bishop Wiguläus Fröschl von Marzoll (born , died ) Bishop of Passau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWaldberg
Ordained BishopTrinité, Chapel, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,536
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1500, Number 4
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 213
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 271

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast