Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Lorenzo de Frías y Espinel

Deceased

Bishop of Jaca


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Apr 1630BornEjea de los Caballeros
30 Sep 168252.4SelectedBishop of Jaca, Spain
8 Mar 168352.8ConfirmedBishop of Jaca, Spain
6 Jun 168353.1Ordained BishopBishop of Jaca, Spain
22 Aug 170474.3DiedBishop of Jaca, Spain

MicroData Summary for Miguel Lorenzo de Frías y Espinel:
Bishop Miguel Lorenzo de Frías y Espinel (born , died ) Bishop of Jaca

  • a bishop for 21.2 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 223
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 132, Number 11,870
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 224, Number 1,386
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1683, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.5, 14 Apr 2015; Data: 21 Apr 2015