Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Roberto da Gangi Vincenzo de Franco, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Crete {Candia}, Greece

Priest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1880Born
14 Jul 190120.5ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
14 Jul 190423.5Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
22 Oct 190524.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
1939²58.0AppointedApostolic Administrator of Crete {Candia}, Greece
1945²64.0CeasedApostolic Administrator of Crete {Candia}, Greece
15 Feb 196786.1DiedPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Roberto da Gangi Vincenzo de Franco
Father Roberto da Gangi Vincenzo de Franco O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Crete {Candia}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGangi
Death PlacePalermo, Archdiocese of Palermo, Italy

  • a priest for 61.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 3 Sep 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.0, 30 Aug 2018; Data: 5 Sep 2018

Quantcast