Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father William Fortune

Deceased

Priest

Titular See: (President/All Hallows College)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Sep 1834Born
Jul 1859³24.8Ordained DeaconDeacon
31 Jul 185924.9Ordained PriestPriest
24 Apr 187439.6AppointedBishop of Sandhurst, Australia
Jun 1874²39.7ResignedBishop-Elect of Sandhurst, Australia
9 Jun 191782.7DiedPriest

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for William Fortune
Father William Fortune (born , died ) Priest

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBroadway, Co. Wexford

  • a priest for 57.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017