Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Giovanni Battista Fonton, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1741¹BornConstantinople
24 Jul 178645.5AppointedBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
Nov 1786²45.8Ordained BishopBishop of Syros (e Milos), Greece
16 Mar 179958.2AppointedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey
16 Mar 179958.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Marcianopolis
26 Aug 181675.6DiedVicar Apostolic of Constantinople, Turkey

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Giovanni Battista Fonton:
Archbishop Giovanni Battista Fonton O.F.M. Conv. (born 1741, died ) Vicar Apostolic of Constantinople

  • a bishop for 29.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 276, and Page 390
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 408, and Page 455
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 205, Number 16,923
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1786, Number 33

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 17 Jan 2016