Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Francesco Fontana

Deceased

Archbishop of Milano {Milan}


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Apr 1288AppointedArchbishop of Messina, Italy
29 Jan 1289AppointedAdministrator of Nola, Italy
23 Aug 1296AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
6 Feb 1308DiedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy

MicroData Summary for Francesco Fontana:
Archbishop Francesco Fontana (died ) Archbishop of Milano {Milan}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 332, and Page 337

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 31 Dec 2013