Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pedro Cardinal Fonseca

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria

Administrator of SigŁenza


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Dec 1412AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
14 Dec 1412Elevated to Cardinal
5 Jun 1413AppointedAdministrator of Astorga, Spain
6 Jun 1419AppointedAdministrator of SigŁenza, Spain
7 Jun 1419ResignedAdministrator of Astorga, Spain
22 Aug 1422DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria

MicroData Summary for Pedro Fonseca:
Cardinal Pedro Fonseca (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria

  • a cardinal for 9.7 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 14 Dec 1412

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013