Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean de Foix

Deceased

Archbishop of Bordeaux, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1483¹Born
9 Dec 150017.9AppointedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France
30 Mar 150320.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
13 Aug 151532.6CeasedApostolic Administrator of Transilvania, Erdély, Siebenbürgen, Romania
25 Jun 152946.4DiedArchbishop of Bordeaux, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean de Foix
Archbishop Jean de Foix (born 1483, died ) Archbishop of Bordeaux

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 100, and Page 142
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1500, Number 44*
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 112

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast