Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Henryk Firlej

Deceased

Bishop of Poznań, Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1599Born
23 Feb 163031.0Ordained PriestPriest
28 Jul 163132.4AppointedBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
30 Nov 163132.8Ordained BishopBishop of Przemyśl, Poland
9 Jul 163536.4AppointedBishop of Poznań, Poland
3 Dec 163536.8DiedBishop of Poznań, Poland

MicroData Summary for Henryk Firlej
Bishop Henryk Firlej (born , died ) Bishop of Poznań

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDemluza

  • a priest for 5.7 years
  • a bishop for 4.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 4, Page 287, and Page 288
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 17,934
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1631, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018