Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Raniero Cardinal Finocchietti

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1715BornLivorno, Italy
16 Dec 178267.9Elevated to CardinalIn Pectore
17 Dec 178772.9Elevated to Cardinal
10 Mar 178873.1InstalledCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Angelo in Pescheria
30 Mar 178974.2AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti
11 Oct 179378.7DiedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

MicroData Summary for Raniero Finocchietti:
Cardinal Raniero Finocchietti (born , died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Agata de’ Goti

  • a cardinal for 10.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 Dec 1782

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013