Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Pietro Cardinal Filargis, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

Note/Previous Titular See: (Antipope Alexander V)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1339¹BornKare, Crete
1357¹18.0ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
5 Oct 138647.8AppointedBishop of Piacenza, Italy
23 Jan 138849.1AppointedBishop of Vicenza, Italy
18 Sep 138950.7AppointedBishop of Novara, Italy
17 May 140263.4AppointedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
12 Jun 140566.4Elevated to Cardinal
12 Jun 140566.4AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santi XII Apostoli
Nov 1408³69.8RemovedArchbishop of Milano {Milan}, Italy
26 Jun 140970.5AppointedBishop
7 Jul 140970.5InstalledBishop
3 May 141071.3DiedBishop

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Pietro Filargis:
Cardinal Pietro Filargis O.F.M. (died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Milano {Milan}

  • a cardinal for 4.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Jun 1405

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013