Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Ludovico Cardinal Fieschi

Deceased

Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro

Administrator of Carpentras


Events

DateEventTitle
29 Mar 1382AppointedBishop of Vercelli, Italy
17 Dec 1384Elevated to Cardinal
17 Dec 1384AppointedCardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro
30 Jul 1387AppointedAdministrator of Vercelli, Italy
31 Oct 1406AppointedAdministrator of Carpentras, France
3 Apr 1423DiedAdministrator of Carpentras, France

MicroData Summary for Ludovico Fieschi:
Cardinal Ludovico Fieschi (died ) Cardinal-Deacon of Sant’Adriano al Foro

  • a cardinal for 38.3 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 17 Dec 1384

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013