Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Manuel Buenaventura Figueroa Barrero

Deceased

Patriarch of West Indies

Titular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Dec 1708³BornSantiago de Compostela, Spain
1737¹28.0Ordained PriestPriest
1 Oct 178273.7SelectedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
16 Dec 178273.9ConfirmedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain
16 Dec 178273.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
23 Mar 178374.2Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Laodicea in Phrygia
3 Apr 178374.2DiedPatriarch of West Indies, Spain

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Manuel Buenaventura Figueroa Barrero:
Patriarch Manuel Buenaventura Figueroa Barrero (born , died ) Patriarch of West Indies

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for -.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 99, Number 514
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1783, Number 36
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 244, and Page 252

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.1, 31 Dec 2015; Data: 1 Jan 2016