Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Thommaso Maria Cardinal Ferrari

Deceased

Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Dec 1649Born
12 Dec 169546.0Elevated to Cardinal
2 Jan 169646.0InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Clemente
20 Aug 171666.7DiedCardinal-Priest of San Clemente

MicroData Summary for Thommaso Maria Ferrari
Thommaso Maria Cardinal Ferrari (born , died ) Cardinal-Priest of San Clemente

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCasalnuovo, Italy

  • a cardinal for 20.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 12 Dec 1695

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast