Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Gonzalo Fernández de Heredia

Deceased

Archbishop of Tarragona, Spain


Events

DateEventTitle
27 Nov 1478AppointedBishop of Barcelona, Spain
14 Jun 1490AppointedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain
21 Nov 1511DiedArchbishop of Tarragona, Spain

MicroData Summary for Gonzalo Fernández de Heredia
Archbishop Gonzalo Fernández de Heredia (died ) Archbishop of Tarragona

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 308
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 102, and Page 248
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1478, Number 45*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast