Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Francisco Fernández de Angulo

Deceased

Bishop of Cartagena (en España)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1642BornFuente el Saz
18 Jun 169654.5AppointedBishop of Cartagena (en España)
8 Sep 169654.7Ordained BishopBishop of Cartagena (en España)
29 Sep 170462.7DiedBishop of Cartagena (en España)

MicroData Summary for Francisco Fernández de Angulo:
Bishop Francisco Fernández de Angulo (died ) Bishop of Cartagena (en España)

  • a bishop for 8.1 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 5, Page 145
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,153
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1500, Page 239, Number 1,479

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 1 Nov 2013