Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo de Fenollet

Deceased

Bishop of Valencia


Events

DateEventTitle
24 Jul 1346AppointedBishop of Vic, Spain
3 Dec 1348AppointedBishop of Valencia, Spain
21 Jun 1356DiedBishop of Valencia, Spain

MicroData Summary for Hugo de Fenollet:
Bishop Hugo de Fenollet (died ) Bishop of Valencia

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 512, and Page 526

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 9 Jan 2014