Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Archangelus Feni, O.P. †

Deceased

Former Archbishop-Elect of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 May 1674Born
1690¹15.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
24 May 169824.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
20 Apr 172247.9AppointedArchbishop of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
1731²56.6ResignedArchbishop-Elect of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia
1747²72.6DiedFormer Archbishop-Elect of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan), Armenia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Archangelus Feni
Father Archangelus Feni O.P. (born , died 1747) Former Archbishop-Elect of Nachitschewan (Naxivan, Nakhtchevan, Nakhchivan)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSiviano

  • a priest for 48.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 282
  • b: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 214, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1722, Number 38

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast