Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Emilio Favarato, O.F.M. Conv. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Ankang [Hinganfu], China


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 May 1904Born
192217.6ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
8 Jul 192824.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Conventual
20 Jun 194137.1AppointedPrefect of Ankang [Hinganfu], China
194641.6ResignedPrefect of Ankang [Hinganfu], China
1947¹42.6DiedPrefect Emeritus of Ankang [Hinganfu], China

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Emilio Favarato
Father Emilio Favarato O.F.M. Conv. (born , died 1947) Prefect Emeritus of Ankang [Hinganfu]

EventPlace
Birth PlacePortelongo, Diocese of Padova {Padua}, Italy

  • a priest for 18.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Bishops-In-China.com, 31 Dec 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast