Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bartolomé Fabro Palacios

Deceased

Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Aug 1735Born
11 Apr 179155.6AppointedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru
10 Jul 179559.8DiedBishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga), Peru

MicroData Summary for Bartolomé Fabro Palacios
Bishop Bartolomé Fabro Palacios (born , died ) Bishop of Ayacucho o Huamanga (Guamanga)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLogroño, Spain

Source(s):
  • b: Episcopologio Español, Volume 1700, Page 110, Number 571
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1791, Number 25
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 231

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast