Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann Matthias von Eyss

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

Titular Bishop of Rosmen (Russionen, Rusköi))


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jul 1669Born
26 Mar 170333.6Ordained PriestPriest of Trier, Germany
10 Mar 171040.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany
10 Mar 171040.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Rosmen (Russionen, Rusköi))
11 May 171040.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Rosmen (Russionen, Rusköi))
25 Nov 172960.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Trier, Germany

MicroData Summary for Johann Matthias von Eyss
Bishop Johann Matthias von Eyss (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Trier

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVallendor

  • a priest for 26.6 years
  • a bishop for 19.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Bischöfe des Heiligen Römischen Reiches
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 335
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1710, Number 6

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast