Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Silvester Everdon

Deceased

Bishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Nov 1246AppointedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
13 Oct 1247Ordained BishopBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain
13 May 1254DiedBishop of Carlisle, England, Great Britain

MicroData Summary for Silvester Everdon
Bishop Silvester Everdon (died ) Bishop of Carlisle

  • a bishop for 6.5 years

Source(s):
  • ob: Registrum Sacrum Anglicanum, Page 60
  • b: Fasti Ecclesiae Anglicanae, Volume 3, Page 232
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 109, Number 9,581

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast