Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Siegfried von Eppenstein

Deceased

Archbishop of Mainz


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1166¹BornEppstein
Nov 1200³34.8SelectedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
Dec 1200²34.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
21 Mar 120236.2ConfirmedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany
Mar 1206³40.1Elevated to Cardinal
Mar 1206³40.1AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
Jun 120842.4ResignedCardinal-Priest of Santa Sabina
9 Sep 123064.6DiedArchbishop of Mainz, Germany

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain ; ⁷ After

MicroData Summary for Siegfried von Eppenstein
Archbishop Siegfried von Eppenstein (born 1166, died ) Archbishop of Mainz

  • a bishop for 29.7 years
  • a cardinal for 2.2 years (Resigned)
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,056
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 321
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 226, Number 18,753
  • ob/c2+: ATh
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 1206

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 9 Feb 2016