Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gerhard von Ehrenberg

Deceased

Bishop of Speyer, Germany


Events

DateEventTitle
25 Sep 1336SelectedBishop of Speyer, Germany
14 Jun 1350ConfirmedBishop of Speyer, Germany
28 Dec 1363DiedBishop of Speyer, Germany

MicroData Summary for Gerhard von Ehrenberg (VIAF: 57836242)
Bishop Gerhard von Ehrenberg (died ) Bishop of Speyer

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 460

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast