Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni (Ebu) de Viterbo

Deceased

Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
1 Jun 1477AppointedBishop of Sarno, Italy
16 Feb 1481AppointedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy
25 Nov 1496DiedBishop of Crotone (Cotrone), Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni (Ebu) de Viterbo
Bishop Giovanni (Ebu) de Viterbo (died ) Bishop of Crotone (Cotrone)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 139, and Page 230
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1,477, Number 30*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast