Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ivan Albert Gliričić Dujmić, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1510¹Born
26 Jul 154939.5AppointedBishop of Modruš, Croatia
19 Mar 155040.2AppointedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia
Aug 1564²54.5DiedBishop of Krk (Veglia), Croatia

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain ; ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Ivan Albert Gliričić Dujmić (VIAF: 305600098)
Bishop Ivan Albert Gliričić Dujmić O.P. (born 1510, died Aug 1564) Bishop of Krk (Veglia)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCattaro, Diocese of Krk (Veglia)

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 247, and Page 328
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1549, Number 23*
  • b: Treccani.it, 27 Sep 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast