Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gilles de Duremont, O. Cist. †

Deceased

Bishop of Coutances, France


Events

DateEventTitle
9 Oct 1439AppointedBishop of Coutances, France
28 Aug 1440Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
29 Jul 1444DiedBishop of Coutances, France

MicroData Summary for Gilles de Duremont
Bishop Gilles de Duremont O. Cist. (died ) Bishop of Coutances

  • a bishop for 3.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 134
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast