Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Johann von Durbheim

Deceased

Bishop of Strasbourg, France


Events

DateEventTitle
23 Sep 1305AppointedBishop of Eichstätt, Germany
18 Feb 1306AppointedBishop of Strasbourg, France
6 Nov 1328DiedBishop of Strasbourg, France

MicroData Summary for Johann von Durbheim (VIAF: 80670473)
Bishop Johann von Durbheim (died ) Bishop of Strasbourg

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 1, Page 243, and Page 105

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast