Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Patriarch Odon de Sala, O.P. †

Deceased

Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}


Events

DateEventTitle
14 Mar 1300AppointedBishop of Terralba, Italy
7 Feb 1302AppointedBishop of Pula (Pola), Croatia
30 Mar 1308AppointedArchbishop of Oristano, Italy
10 May 1312AppointedArchbishop of Pisa, Italy
6 Jun 1323AppointedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}
1328¹DiedTitular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Odon de Sala:
Patriarch Odon de Sala O.P. , Titular Patriarch of Alexandria {Alessandria}

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 400, and Page 82
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 101, and Page 404
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 1, Page 479

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.6, 1 Jan 2014; data: 8 Jan 2014