Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ottavio del Rosso

Deceased

Bishop of Volterra, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Feb 1642Born
30 May 166624.2Ordained PriestPriest
14 Apr 168139.1AppointedBishop of Volterra, Italy
20 Apr 168139.1Ordained BishopBishop of Volterra, Italy
31 Dec 171472.8DiedBishop of Volterra, Italy

MicroData Summary for Ottavio del Rosso
Bishop Ottavio del Rosso (born , died ) Bishop of Volterra

EventPlace
Birth PlaceFirenze

  • a priest for 48.5 years
  • a bishop for 33.6 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 418
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,851
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1681, Number 43

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast