Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jan Drohojowski

Deceased

Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1505¹Born
26 Aug 154540.6AppointedBishop of Kamyanets-Podilskyi (Kamieniec), Ukraine
19 Feb 154641.1AppointedBishop of Chełm, Poland
25 Feb 155146.1AppointedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland
25 Jun 155752.4DiedBishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze), Poland

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jan Drohojowski
Bishop Jan Drohojowski (born 1505, died ) Bishop of Włocławek (Kujawy, Kalisze)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDrohojowie

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 336, and Page 164
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 148
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1545, Number 18*

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast