Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Andrea Della Rocca, C.R.L. †

Deceased

Bishop of Accia and Mariana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Jul 1661³BornGenova
23 Sep 168423.2Ordained PriestPriest of Canons Regular of the Congregation of the Most Holy Saviour of the Lateran
28 Nov 170746.3AppointedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France
Mar 1720³58.6DiedBishop of Accia and Mariana, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Andrea Della Rocca:
Bishop Andrea Della Rocca C.R.L. (born , died Mar 1720) Bishop of Accia and Mariana

  • a priest for 35.4 years

Source(s):
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1707
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 256
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1707, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.7, 19 Jun 2015; Data: 23 Jun 2015