Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Martino Dragolovich (Dragolio)

Deceased

Bishop of Nona (Nin)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Oct 1655³BornSplit
16 Jul 170347.7AppointedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
22 Jul 170347.7Ordained BishopBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia
Dec 1708³53.0DiedBishop of Nona (Nin), Croatia

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Martino Dragolovich (Dragolio):
Bishop Martino Dragolovich (Dragolio) (born , died Dec 1708) Bishop of Nona (Nin)

  • a bishop for 5.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 5, Page 292
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1703, Number 18

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.6, 2 May 2015; Data: 5 Jun 2015