Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François Desprez

Deceased

Bishop of Aosta, Italy


Events

DateEventTitle
4 Apr 1464AppointedBishop of Aosta, Italy
22 Jul 1464Ordained BishopBishop of Aosta, Italy
22 May 1511DiedBishop of Aosta, Italy

MicroData Summary for François Desprez
Bishop François Desprez (died ) Bishop of Aosta

EventPlace
Ordained BishopCathedral, Aosta, Diocese of Aosta

  • a bishop for 46.8 years

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 2, Page 98
  • ob: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 119, Number 10,623
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 3, Page 122
  • b: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1464, Number 5

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 5 Nov 2018

Quantcast